Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/22/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/22/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/22/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/22/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/31/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 01/31/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/31/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/31/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/31/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/31/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/01/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/07/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/07/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/07/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/08/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/09/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/30/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/25/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/06/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew