Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/22/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/22/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/22/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/22/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/26/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/29/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/11/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/11/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/11/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/11/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 07/11/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/11/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/11/2006
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/11/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 07/11/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/11/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/12/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/12/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 07/12/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/12/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/12/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/12/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/12/2006
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/12/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/12/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/12/2006
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 07/12/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/12/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/12/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/12/2006
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 07/12/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/12/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/12/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/12/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 07/12/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/12/2006
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/12/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/12/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/12/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/12/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/12/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/12/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/12/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/13/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/13/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/13/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 07/13/2006
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/13/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/13/2006
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/13/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/13/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/13/2006
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/13/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/13/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/13/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/13/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/13/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/26/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/19/2006