Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/01/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 11/01/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/01/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/01/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/01/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 11/01/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/01/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/01/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/01/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/01/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/01/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/01/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/01/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/02/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/02/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/02/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/02/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/03/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/03/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/03/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/03/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/03/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/03/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/03/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/03/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/03/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/03/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/03/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 11/04/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/04/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/04/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/04/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/04/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/04/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/04/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/04/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/04/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/04/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 11/04/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/04/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/04/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/04/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 11/04/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 11/04/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/04/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/04/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/04/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/04/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/04/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/04/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/04/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/04/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/04/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 11/04/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 11/04/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/04/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/04/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/04/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/04/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/04/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/07/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/07/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/07/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 11/08/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/08/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/08/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 11/08/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/08/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 11/08/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/08/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/08/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/08/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/08/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/08/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/08/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/08/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/08/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/08/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/08/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/08/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/08/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 11/08/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/08/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/08/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/08/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/08/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/08/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 11/08/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/08/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/08/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/08/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/08/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/08/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 11/08/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/08/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/08/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/08/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/08/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/08/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/08/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/09/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/09/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/09/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/09/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/09/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/09/2005