Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 09/15/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/22/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/22/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/22/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/22/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/22/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/17/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/17/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 10/26/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/26/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/29/2006