Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/08/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/08/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/08/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/08/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 02/08/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/08/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/08/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/08/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/08/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 02/08/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/08/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/08/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 02/08/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/08/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 02/08/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/08/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/08/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/08/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/08/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/08/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/08/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/08/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/09/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/09/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 02/09/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/09/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/10/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/16/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/16/2005