Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 07/26/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 07/26/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 07/26/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 07/26/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/26/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/26/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 07/26/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 07/26/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 07/26/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 07/26/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/27/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 07/28/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/28/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/28/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/28/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/29/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/29/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/29/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/29/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/29/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 07/29/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/29/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/29/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/29/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/29/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/06/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/06/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/06/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/06/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/06/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/06/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 09/08/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 09/08/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/08/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/08/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/14/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/14/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/22/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 09/22/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/27/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/28/2005