Text: H.Res.378 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Reported in House (07/27/2005)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 109th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Res. 378 Reported in House (RH)]







                                                  House Calendar No. 73
109th CONGRESS
  1st Session
H. RES. 378

                      [Report No. 109-196, Part I]

  Recognizing and honoring the 15th anniversary of the signing of the 
                Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                             July 25, 2005

Mr. Sensenbrenner (for himself, Mr. Hoyer, Mr. Owens, Mr. Ramstad, Mr. 
Hyde, Mr. Coble, Mr. Smith of Texas, Ms. Ros-Lehtinen, Mr. Conyers, Mr. 
Langevin, Ms. Pryce of Ohio, and Mr. Reynolds) submitted the following 
 resolution; which was referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and 
     in addition to the Committees on Education and the Workforce, 
   Transportation and Infrastructure, and Energy and Commerce, for a 
 period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for 
consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the 
                          committee concerned

                             July 27, 2005

              Reported from the Committee on the Judiciary

                             July 27, 2005

  Committees on Education and the Workforce, Energy and Commerce, and 
  Transportation and Infrastructure discharged; referred to the House 
                   Calendar and ordered to be printed

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
  Recognizing and honoring the 15th anniversary of the signing of the 
                Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990.

Whereas July 26, 2005, marks the 15th anniversary of the signing of the 
        Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990;
Whereas the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 was one of the most 
        significant pieces of civil rights legislation since the Civil Rights 
        Act of 1964;
Whereas the purpose of the Americans with Disabilities Act was--

    (1) to provide a clear and comprehensive national mandate for the 
elimination of discrimination against individuals with disabilities;

    (2) to provide clear, strong, consistent, enforceable standards 
addressing discrimination against individuals with disabilities;

    (3) to ensure that the Federal government plays a central role in 
enforcing the standards established in the Act on behalf of individuals 
with disabilities; and

    (4) to invoke the sweep of congressional authority, including the power 
to enforce the 14th amendment to the Constitution and to regulate commerce, 
in order to address the major areas of discrimination faced day-to-day by 
people with disabilities;

Whereas Congress passed the Americans with Disabilities Act after two years of 
        extensive and exhaustive hearings detailing the historic and staggering 
        isolation faced by people with disabilities;
Whereas, prior to the passage of the Americans with Disabilities Act, people 
        with disabilities faced significantly lower employment rates, lower 
        graduation rates, and higher rates of poverty than people without 
        disabilities, and were too often denied the opportunity to fully 
        participate in society due to intolerance and unfair stereotypes;
Whereas the Americans with Disabilities Act was passed because existing Federal 
        and State laws were insufficient to address the pervasive discrimination 
        that existed for disabled Americans;
Whereas Congress passed the Americans with Disabilities Act with overwhelming 
        bipartisan majorities, and President George H.W. Bush signed the bill 
        into law on July 26, 1990;
Whereas the Americans with Disabilities Act established the world's first 
        comprehensive prohibition of discrimination on the basis of disability 
        in the areas of employment, public accommodations, public services, 
        transportation, and telecommunications;
Whereas, in the 15 years since the enactment of the Americans with Disabilities 
        Act, significant changes have occurred in the United States to--

    (1) facilitate greater inclusion and accessibility for millions of 
people with disabilities;

    (2) increase the empowerment of individuals with disabilities toward 
greater independence and self-sufficiency; and

    (3) reduce unfounded negative impressions and stereotypes about people 
with disabilities, and to foster greater understanding and tolerance in 
society; and

Whereas commemorating the 15th anniversary of the signing of the Americans with 
        Disabilities Act both highlights the achievements that people with 
        disabilities have gained since passage of the Act and recognizes the 
        work left to be done to ensure that disabled Americans are fully able to 
        participate in society: Now therefore, be it
    Resolved,  That the House of Representatives--
            (1) recognizes and honors the 15th anniversary of the 
        signing of the Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990;
            (2) recognizes and appreciates the work of the countless 
        individuals and organizations in the disability rights 
        community who fought tirelessly to advance the cause of people 
        with disabilities, leading to the passage and enactment of the 
        Americans with Disabilities Act, and who continue to work 
        towards improving the lives of disabled Americans;
            (3) reaffirms its commitment to promoting the civil and 
        constitutional rights of Americans with disabilities and 
        recognizes the important role of the Nation's Federal courts in 
        securing the rights of Americans under the Americans with 
        Disabilities Act;
            (4) continues to strongly support the purposes and goals of 
        the Americans with Disabilities Act; and
            (5) encourages all Americans to recognize and celebrate the 
        important historical significance of this Act.
                                                  House Calendar No. 73

109th CONGRESS

  1st Session

                              H. RES. 378

                      [Report No. 109-196, Part I]

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION

  Recognizing and honoring the 15th anniversary of the signing of the 
                Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990.

_______________________________________________________________________

                             July 27, 2005

              Reported from the Committee on the Judiciary

                             July 27, 2005

  Committees on Education and the Workforce, Energy and Commerce, and 
  Transportation and Infrastructure discharged; referred to the House 
                   Calendar and ordered to be printed