Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/19/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/22/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/22/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/22/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/22/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/22/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/22/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/22/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/22/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/22/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/22/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/22/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/22/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/22/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/22/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/22/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/22/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/22/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/22/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/22/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/22/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 07/22/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 07/22/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/22/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/22/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/22/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/22/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/22/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/22/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 07/22/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/22/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/22/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/22/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/22/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 07/22/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/22/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 07/22/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/22/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/22/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/25/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/25/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/25/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/25/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/25/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 07/25/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/25/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/25/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/25/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/25/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/28/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/28/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/28/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/07/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/07/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/07/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/07/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/07/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/07/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/07/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/13/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 09/13/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/13/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/13/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/13/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/15/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/15/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/29/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/29/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/06/2005