Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/15/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/15/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/16/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/16/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/16/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/16/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/16/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/16/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/17/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/17/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/17/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/17/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/17/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/17/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/22/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/22/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/22/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/22/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/22/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/22/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/22/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/22/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/22/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/22/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/22/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/22/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/22/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/22/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/24/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/24/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/24/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/28/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/28/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/28/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/14/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/14/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/14/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/14/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/14/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/14/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/14/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/18/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/18/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 07/21/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/21/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/21/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/26/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/26/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/08/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/08/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/08/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/08/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/08/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/08/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 09/08/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/08/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/14/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/15/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/15/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/22/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/22/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 10/06/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/06/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/07/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/07/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/07/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 12/07/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/07/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/01/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/01/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/01/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/01/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/01/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/01/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/01/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/01/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/14/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/14/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/14/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/16/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/19/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/19/2006
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/19/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 06/16/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/20/2006