Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/14/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 06/14/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 06/14/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 06/14/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/14/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/15/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/16/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/17/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/17/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/19/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/19/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/19/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/19/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/19/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/25/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/25/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/25/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/06/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/06/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/12/2006