Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/16/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/16/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/16/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/16/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/16/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/16/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/16/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 05/16/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 05/16/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/16/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/16/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/16/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 05/16/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/16/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/16/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/16/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/16/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/16/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/16/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/16/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/18/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/18/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/18/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/18/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/18/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/18/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/23/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/23/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/24/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/24/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/24/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/24/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/25/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/25/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/25/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/25/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/25/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/25/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/25/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/26/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/26/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/07/2005