Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/12/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/19/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/07/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/12/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/01/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/27/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/27/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 06/27/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/27/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 06/27/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/27/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 06/27/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/27/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/27/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/28/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/28/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/28/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/28/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/28/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/28/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/28/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/28/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/28/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/28/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/28/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/28/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/28/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/28/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/28/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/28/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 06/28/2006
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/28/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/28/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/28/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/28/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/28/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/28/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/28/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/28/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/28/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/29/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 06/29/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/29/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/29/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/29/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/29/2006
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/29/2006
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 06/29/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/29/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/29/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/29/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/29/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/29/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/29/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/29/2006
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/29/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/25/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/25/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/25/2006