Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/01/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/01/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/01/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/01/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/01/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/01/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/01/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/01/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/01/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/01/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/01/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/01/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/01/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/01/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/01/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/01/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/01/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/01/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/01/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/01/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/01/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/01/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/01/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/02/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/02/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/02/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/02/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/02/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/03/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/03/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/08/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/08/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/08/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/08/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/08/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/10/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/10/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/14/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/14/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/14/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/14/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/05/2005