Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 07/13/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 07/13/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 07/13/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 07/13/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/13/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 07/13/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/13/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/14/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/19/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/13/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/22/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/23/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/23/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 05/23/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/23/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/23/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/23/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/23/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/25/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/25/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/25/2006
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/06/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/14/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/22/2006
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/19/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/19/2006