Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 06/30/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/07/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/15/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/21/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 09/22/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/08/2006