Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/25/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/27/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 11/10/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/17/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/17/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/17/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 12/08/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/08/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 12/16/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 02/28/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/08/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 06/22/2006