Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 01/25/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/25/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/25/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 01/25/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 01/25/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 01/25/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/01/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/01/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/01/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 02/01/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/01/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/01/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 02/02/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/02/2005
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/02/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/08/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/08/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 02/09/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/09/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/09/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/15/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/15/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/01/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/01/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/01/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/02/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/02/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/02/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/07/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 03/07/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/07/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/07/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/07/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/07/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/07/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/07/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/07/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/08/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/10/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/10/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/10/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/15/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/15/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/17/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/05/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 04/12/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 04/12/2005
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/14/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/18/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 04/18/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/18/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/26/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/26/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/26/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/26/2005
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/26/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/28/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/28/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/28/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/03/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 05/03/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/03/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/03/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/10/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/10/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 05/10/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/10/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/10/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 05/10/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/10/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/10/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 05/10/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/10/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/10/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/17/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/17/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 05/17/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/17/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/17/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/17/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/19/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/23/2005
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 05/23/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/23/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/23/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/26/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/07/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/07/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/07/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/08/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/08/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/08/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/13/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/13/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/13/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/13/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/13/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/13/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/13/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/13/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/13/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/13/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/13/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/13/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/13/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/13/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/13/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/13/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/13/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 06/13/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/14/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/14/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/14/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 06/14/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/14/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/14/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/14/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/14/2005
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/14/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/14/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/14/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/14/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/14/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/14/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/14/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/14/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 06/14/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/14/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/14/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/14/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/14/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/14/2005
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/14/2005