Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/28/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/28/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/28/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/01/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/06/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/06/2006
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/06/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/07/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/07/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/07/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/14/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/14/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 03/14/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/16/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/16/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/28/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/28/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/28/2006
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/29/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/30/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/04/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/04/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/04/2006
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 04/05/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/05/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/25/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/25/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/25/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/27/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/27/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/10/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/10/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/11/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/17/2006
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/17/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/17/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/17/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/18/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/12/2006
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/15/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/19/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/19/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/29/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/29/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/12/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 07/17/2006
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/18/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/24/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/28/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/28/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/07/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/14/2006
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/14/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/14/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/26/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/27/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 12/05/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/06/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/06/2006