Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 12/15/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 12/15/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 12/15/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 12/15/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 12/15/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 12/15/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 12/15/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 12/15/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 12/15/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 12/15/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 12/15/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 12/15/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 12/15/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 12/15/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 12/15/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 12/15/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 12/15/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 12/15/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 12/15/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 12/15/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 12/15/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/22/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/22/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 12/22/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/31/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/07/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/12/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/12/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/12/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/12/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/12/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/12/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/12/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/13/2006