Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 07/28/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/14/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/14/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/15/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/15/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/15/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/15/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/15/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/15/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/15/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/21/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/21/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 09/21/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/21/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/21/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/21/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/21/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/22/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/22/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/22/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/22/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/22/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/22/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/22/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/22/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/22/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/22/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/22/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 09/22/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/22/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/22/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/22/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/22/2005
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 09/22/2005
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/22/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/22/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/22/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/27/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/27/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/27/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/27/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 09/27/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/27/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/28/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/28/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/28/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/28/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/28/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/28/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/28/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/29/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/29/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/29/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/06/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/06/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/17/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 10/17/2005
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 10/17/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/17/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/17/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/20/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/25/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/25/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/25/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 10/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 10/25/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 10/31/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 10/31/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/03/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/03/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/03/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 11/03/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 11/03/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/03/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 11/03/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 11/03/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 11/03/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/08/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/08/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 11/08/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/08/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 11/08/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 11/08/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 11/08/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 11/08/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 11/08/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 11/08/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/08/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/09/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 11/09/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/09/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/09/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 11/15/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/15/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/15/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/16/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/16/2005