Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/30/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/30/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 06/30/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/11/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/11/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/11/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/12/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/12/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/14/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/18/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 07/21/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/27/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/07/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/07/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/28/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/28/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/28/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/28/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/06/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/06/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/07/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/17/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 10/17/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 10/25/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/25/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/25/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/28/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 11/04/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/15/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 12/06/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 12/06/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/06/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/14/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/01/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/08/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/08/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/08/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/09/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/15/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/30/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/04/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/06/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/06/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/20/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/20/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/21/2006