Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/26/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 05/26/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/26/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/26/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/07/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/07/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 09/14/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/20/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/20/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/20/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/20/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/20/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/20/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/20/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/20/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 09/20/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/20/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/21/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/26/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/26/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/29/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/06/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/06/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 10/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/06/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/18/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/18/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/18/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/18/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/01/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 11/01/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/01/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/01/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/04/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 11/04/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 11/04/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/15/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/06/2005