Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/25/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/25/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 01/25/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/01/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 02/01/2005
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/01/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 02/08/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/09/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 02/15/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/15/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/17/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/12/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 04/12/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/12/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/20/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/21/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/26/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 04/27/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/27/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/27/2005
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/03/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/03/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 05/09/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/10/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/11/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/12/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/19/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/23/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/08/2005
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/09/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/15/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/22/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/22/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/23/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/24/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/28/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/14/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/18/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/19/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/19/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 07/25/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/25/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/26/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/28/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/08/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/29/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/22/2006
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/22/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/13/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/17/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/24/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/26/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/06/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/12/2006