Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/08/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/08/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/08/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/08/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/08/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/08/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/08/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/08/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/08/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/08/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/08/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/08/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/08/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/08/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/08/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/08/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/08/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/08/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/09/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/09/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/09/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/09/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/09/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/09/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/09/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/09/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/10/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/10/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/10/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/10/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/15/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/15/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/15/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/15/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/17/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/17/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/17/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/17/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/17/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/06/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/06/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/14/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/14/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 04/14/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/28/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/28/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/04/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/16/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/23/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/16/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/21/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/06/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 10/06/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/17/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/01/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/02/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/04/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/04/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/07/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 11/08/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/08/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/15/2005
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 11/15/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 11/15/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/15/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 11/16/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/16/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 11/16/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/16/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/06/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/06/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 12/06/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 12/07/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 12/07/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/08/2005