Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/26/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/13/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 12/15/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/01/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/26/2006