Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 05/05/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/09/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/09/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/09/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/09/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/09/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/09/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/09/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/09/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/13/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/13/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/13/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/17/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/30/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/30/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/30/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/30/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/30/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/30/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/30/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/30/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/30/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/30/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/30/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/30/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/30/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/30/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/30/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/14/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 07/14/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/20/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/20/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/21/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/22/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/27/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/27/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/28/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/28/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/29/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/29/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/07/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/07/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/07/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/07/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/07/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/08/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/13/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/17/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/19/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/27/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/27/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 11/02/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 11/02/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 11/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/07/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 12/07/2005