Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/09/2005
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/09/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/09/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/09/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/09/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/09/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/15/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/15/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/15/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/15/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/15/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/15/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/15/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/15/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/15/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/15/2005
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 03/15/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/15/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 04/05/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/05/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/14/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/14/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/14/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 04/14/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/14/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 04/21/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/21/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 04/28/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/28/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/05/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/18/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/18/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 05/25/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/25/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/20/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 07/20/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/15/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/15/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/21/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 12/06/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/06/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 12/06/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 12/06/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 12/22/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/01/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/01/2006