Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/01/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/01/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/02/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/02/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/10/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/10/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/16/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/16/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/17/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/17/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/05/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/05/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/06/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/08/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 04/08/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/08/2005
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/08/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/08/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/12/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/13/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/13/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/19/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/19/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/19/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/19/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/19/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/26/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/26/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 04/26/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/26/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/27/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/27/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/28/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/02/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/05/2005
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/05/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/17/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/19/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/24/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/07/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/07/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/07/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/07/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/07/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/13/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/16/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/17/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/20/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/22/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/22/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/22/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/23/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/24/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/24/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 06/28/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/30/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/11/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/18/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/18/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/19/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 07/21/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 07/22/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/26/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/06/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/06/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/06/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/12/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/13/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/13/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/15/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/20/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/20/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/21/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/21/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/26/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/26/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 09/28/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/28/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/28/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/29/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/29/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/29/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/29/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 10/03/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/03/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 10/03/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/06/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 10/06/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/17/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 10/17/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/18/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/19/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/19/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/19/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/19/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/19/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/20/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/20/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 10/20/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/20/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/20/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 10/20/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 10/26/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 10/26/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 10/26/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/26/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/26/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/26/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 10/26/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/26/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/28/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/01/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/03/2005