Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 05/02/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/03/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/03/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/03/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/03/2006
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/03/2006
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/03/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/03/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/03/2006
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 05/03/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/03/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/03/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/03/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/03/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/03/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/03/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/03/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/03/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/03/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/03/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/03/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/03/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/03/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/03/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/03/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/03/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/03/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/03/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/03/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/03/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/03/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/03/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/03/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/03/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/09/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/09/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 05/09/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/09/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/09/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/09/2006
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/09/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/09/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/09/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/09/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/09/2006
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/09/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/09/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/09/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/09/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/09/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/09/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/09/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/09/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/09/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/09/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/09/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/09/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/09/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/09/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/09/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/09/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/09/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 05/09/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/11/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/11/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 05/11/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/11/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/11/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/11/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/11/2006
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/11/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/11/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/11/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/11/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/11/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/11/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/11/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/11/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/11/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/17/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/17/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/17/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/17/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/17/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/17/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/17/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/17/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/17/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/17/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/17/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/17/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/17/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/17/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/17/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/17/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/17/2006
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/17/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 05/17/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/17/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/17/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/17/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/17/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/17/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/17/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/17/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/17/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/17/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/17/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/17/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/17/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/17/2006