Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/08/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/08/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/08/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/08/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/08/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 03/08/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/10/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/14/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/17/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/05/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/05/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/05/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/05/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/14/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/14/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 04/14/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/19/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 04/19/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 04/19/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/03/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/05/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/11/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/11/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/11/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/11/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/17/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/17/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/17/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/17/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/23/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 05/23/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/25/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/07/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 06/07/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/07/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/08/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/08/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/13/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/13/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/14/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/14/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/17/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/20/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/22/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/22/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 06/22/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/24/2005
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 06/24/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/24/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/24/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/24/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/24/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/28/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/28/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/28/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/28/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/28/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/30/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/30/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/11/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/11/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/11/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/11/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/11/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/13/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/18/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 07/18/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/20/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/20/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/20/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/20/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/25/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/25/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 07/25/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/25/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/25/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/27/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/27/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/28/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/29/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/29/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/29/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/07/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/07/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/07/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/07/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/07/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 09/07/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/08/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 09/08/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/13/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/15/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/20/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 09/20/2005
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 09/22/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/22/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/07/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 10/18/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/19/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/20/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/01/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/09/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 11/16/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/16/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/16/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/18/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 12/06/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/06/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 12/06/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 12/06/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 12/08/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 12/13/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 12/13/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/01/2006
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 02/01/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/15/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/15/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 02/15/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/08/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/19/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/25/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/06/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/06/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 09/07/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/07/2006