Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/17/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 02/17/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/17/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/17/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 03/17/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/17/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/17/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/17/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/17/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/12/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/12/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/12/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 04/12/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/12/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/27/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/27/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/29/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/29/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/07/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/07/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/07/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/07/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/07/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/07/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/07/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/07/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/07/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/07/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 10/17/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 12/06/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/06/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 12/06/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 12/08/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/01/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/30/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/30/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/26/2006