Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/08/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/08/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/08/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/08/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/08/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/08/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/10/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/10/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/10/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 03/10/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/10/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/10/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/10/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 03/10/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/10/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/10/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/10/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/10/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/10/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/17/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/17/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/17/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/17/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/12/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 04/12/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/12/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/12/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/12/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/12/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/13/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/14/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/21/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/29/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/29/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/29/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/29/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/29/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/14/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/14/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/14/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/26/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/26/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/26/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/28/2005
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/28/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/28/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 07/28/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/29/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/29/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/07/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/07/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/07/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/07/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/07/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/08/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/08/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/29/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/29/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/28/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/26/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 04/26/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/18/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/19/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/22/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/22/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew