Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 02/17/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/17/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/08/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/08/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8] 03/08/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/10/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/10/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/12/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/27/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/27/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 04/27/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 04/27/2005
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/04/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 05/04/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/24/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/08/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/08/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/14/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/20/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/21/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/22/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 09/07/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/15/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/27/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 10/07/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 10/17/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/19/2005
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 10/25/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 11/02/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 11/02/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/07/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/07/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/07/2005
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 11/18/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 12/08/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 12/14/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 02/15/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/15/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/28/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/28/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/09/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/14/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/14/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/29/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/04/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/25/2006
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/07/2006
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/08/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 06/08/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/11/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/06/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/13/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/26/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/26/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/27/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/27/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/27/2006
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 09/27/2006
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/27/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/27/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 11/13/2006
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 11/13/2006