Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/01/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 03/01/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 03/01/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/01/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/01/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/01/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/01/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/02/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/02/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/03/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/03/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/08/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/08/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/10/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/10/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/14/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/17/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/06/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/12/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/28/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/06/2005