Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/16/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/03/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/05/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/12/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/12/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 05/23/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/26/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/26/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/07/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/15/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/22/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/18/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/18/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/21/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/06/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 09/22/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/28/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/14/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/29/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/04/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/04/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/27/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/27/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/09/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/09/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/18/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/13/2006
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 06/26/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/06/2006