Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/05/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/05/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/07/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/09/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/09/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/21/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/21/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/23/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/11/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/01/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/02/2006