Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/08/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/08/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/08/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/08/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/08/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/08/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/08/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/08/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/08/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/08/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/08/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/08/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/08/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/16/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/16/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 06/21/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/21/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/21/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/21/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/23/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/23/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/29/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/29/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/29/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/29/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/29/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/29/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/30/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/12/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/14/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/14/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/19/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/08/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/29/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/12/2006