Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/15/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/15/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/15/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 02/17/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/01/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/08/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/10/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/10/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/15/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 04/05/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/05/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/05/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/13/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/13/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/13/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/13/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/26/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 04/26/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/26/2005
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/28/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/28/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/28/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/04/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/04/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/04/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/05/2005
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 05/05/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/10/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/11/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/17/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/19/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 05/25/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/25/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/09/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/15/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/21/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/24/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/20/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/26/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/27/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/15/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/21/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/22/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/22/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/28/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 12/06/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/14/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/14/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/16/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/16/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/02/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/02/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/10/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/10/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 05/23/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/12/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 07/26/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/25/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/28/2006