Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/10/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/15/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/15/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/15/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/15/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/16/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/16/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/16/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/16/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/17/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/17/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/17/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/17/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/01/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/01/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/01/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/01/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/02/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/02/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 03/02/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/02/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/02/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/03/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/03/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/08/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/08/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/14/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/14/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/14/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/14/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/14/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/16/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/06/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/06/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/06/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/06/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/06/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/21/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/27/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/04/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/04/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/05/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/10/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/17/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/18/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/18/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/25/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/16/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/16/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/16/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/16/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/16/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/16/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/21/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/30/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/12/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/12/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/12/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/14/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/19/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/26/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 07/26/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/26/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/27/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/28/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/28/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/06/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/06/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/15/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/15/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/29/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/17/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/17/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/20/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 11/04/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 12/06/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/01/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/08/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/06/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/27/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/22/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/27/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/27/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/20/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 09/19/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/19/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/19/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/07/2006