Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 02/10/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/17/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/17/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/17/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/17/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/17/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/17/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/21/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/21/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/21/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/27/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/27/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/04/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/04/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/04/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/17/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/17/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/17/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/17/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/19/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/19/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/19/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/19/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/25/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/25/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/25/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/25/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/25/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/25/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/07/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/07/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/28/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/28/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/18/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/18/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/21/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/21/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/07/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/06/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/06/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/06/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/24/2006
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/13/2006