Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/09/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/01/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/01/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/01/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/01/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/01/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/01/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/01/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/01/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/01/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/01/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/01/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/09/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/15/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/15/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/15/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/15/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/15/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/15/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/17/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/17/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/17/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/17/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/17/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/17/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/17/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/05/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/05/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 04/05/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/05/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/05/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/05/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/19/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/19/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/19/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/19/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/04/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/04/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/04/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 05/26/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/26/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/26/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/26/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/17/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/29/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/18/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/01/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/10/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 11/16/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/16/2005
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/15/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/28/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/28/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/28/2006
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/28/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/28/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/28/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/28/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 03/30/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/04/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 04/05/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/25/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/23/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/25/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/25/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/08/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 06/13/2006