Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/17/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/01/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/08/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/10/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/14/2005
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/16/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/17/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/05/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 04/12/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 04/12/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/14/2005
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/26/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/26/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/11/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/11/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/11/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/11/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/17/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/17/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/19/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/23/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/11/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/11/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 09/07/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/15/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/28/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/18/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/18/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/01/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/01/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/27/2006