Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 02/08/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/17/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/17/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/17/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/17/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/17/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/17/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/17/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/17/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/17/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/03/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/03/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/03/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/03/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/03/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/10/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/10/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/10/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/10/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/10/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/10/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/17/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/17/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/06/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/13/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/13/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/13/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/13/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/13/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/13/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/13/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/14/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/14/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/14/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/14/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/14/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 04/14/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/19/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/26/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/03/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/04/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/04/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/23/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/26/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/24/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/24/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/24/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/24/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/24/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/24/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/24/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/24/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/24/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/29/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/29/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/30/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/30/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/29/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 06/21/2006