Refine your search

Date Major Actions
01/15/2007 Became Public Law No: 109-482.
01/15/2007 Signed by President.
01/03/2007 Presented to President.
12/09/2006 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR 12/8/2006 H9235-9242)
12/08/2006 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/08/2006 Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/26/2006 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 2 (Roll no. 485).(text: CR H7453-7459)
09/26/2006 Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 109-687.
09/25/2006 Introduced in House