Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/21/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/25/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 09/25/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/25/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/25/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/25/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/25/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/25/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/25/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/25/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/25/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/25/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 09/25/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/26/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/26/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/26/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/26/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/26/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/26/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 09/26/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/26/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 09/26/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 09/26/2006
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 09/27/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/27/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/27/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/27/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 09/27/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/27/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/27/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/27/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/27/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/28/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/28/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/28/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/28/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/28/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/28/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/28/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/28/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/28/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/28/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/29/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/29/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/29/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/29/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/29/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/29/2006
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/29/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 09/29/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/29/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/29/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/29/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/29/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 09/29/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/29/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/29/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/13/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/13/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 11/15/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 11/15/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 11/15/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/05/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/05/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 12/05/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 12/08/2006