Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 09/13/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 09/13/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 09/13/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/14/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/19/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/20/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/21/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/28/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/28/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/28/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/28/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/29/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 09/29/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 09/29/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/14/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/14/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/05/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/08/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/08/2006