Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/02/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/09/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/09/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/09/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/09/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/09/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/09/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/09/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/09/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/15/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/15/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/02/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/02/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/09/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/09/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/09/2005
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/09/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/09/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/17/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/17/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/05/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/18/2005