Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/14/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/14/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/21/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 09/21/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 09/26/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/26/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/28/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/29/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 11/13/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 11/13/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 11/13/2006