Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 07/28/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 07/28/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/28/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 07/28/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/28/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/28/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/06/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/06/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/06/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/06/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/06/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/06/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/06/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/12/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/12/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/12/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/12/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/12/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/12/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/12/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/13/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/13/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/13/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/13/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 09/13/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/13/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/14/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/19/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/19/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/19/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/19/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/19/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/19/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/19/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/19/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/19/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/19/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/19/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/19/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/19/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/20/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/20/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/20/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/20/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/21/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/21/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/21/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/26/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/26/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/26/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/26/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/26/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/26/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/26/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/26/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/27/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/27/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/27/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/28/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/28/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/28/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/28/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/29/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/29/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/29/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/29/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/29/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/29/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/29/2006
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/14/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/14/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 11/14/2006