Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 04/12/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/20/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/20/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 04/20/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/20/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/20/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/20/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/21/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/21/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 04/28/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/28/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 06/16/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/20/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/13/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/19/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/19/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/26/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/28/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/28/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/07/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/07/2005
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 10/18/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 10/25/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/27/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/27/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 11/08/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 11/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 11/08/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/15/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 12/07/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/07/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/07/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/14/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/15/2006
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/05/2006
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/05/2006